Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiberius Ugolini

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Sep 1485AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
12 Mar 1489Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
Apr 1519³DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tiberius Ugolini
Bishop Tiberius Ugolini (died Apr 1519) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Sauveur in Militibus, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1489, Number 1
  • c4: CB, 31 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast