Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Tyszkiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹BornBrest
1620²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 162731.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 May 162731.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
19 Dec 163337.9AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
9 Dec 164953.9AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 Jan 165660.0DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Tyszkiewicz:
Bishop Jerzy Tyszkiewicz (died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 240, and Page 304
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015