Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
11 Mar 1888 | Born | ||
29 Apr 1912 | 24.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill |
Aug 1920³ | 32.3 | Appointed | Superior of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia |
23 Jul 1926 | 38.3 | Resigned | Superior of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia |
13 Nov 1948 | 60.6 | Died | Superior Emeritus of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Middlesburgh, Great Britain |
Death Place | London, Great Britain |
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠