Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Roberto Cardinal Tucci, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1921BornNapoli, Italy
24 Aug 195029.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Feb 200179.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio
21 Feb 200179.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 201189.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio
14 Apr 201593.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio

MicroData Summary for Roberto Tucci:
Roberto Cardinal Tucci S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a cardinal for 14.1 years

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2011
  • d: CB, 14 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015