Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guarnerio Trotti

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1571AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
9 Sep 1571Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
15 Jan 1584DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Guarnerio Trotti (VIAF: 89447024)
Bishop Guarnerio Trotti (died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. André du Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 103
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 18, Number 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018