Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thilo von Trotha

Deceased

Bishop of Merseburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1443Born
21 Jul 146622.9AppointedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
8 Mar 146723.5Ordained BishopBishop of Merseburg, Germany
5 Mar 151470.5DiedBishop of Merseburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Thilo von Trotha
Bishop Thilo von Trotha (born , died ) Bishop of Merseburg

  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,614
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,777
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016