Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Olav Trondsson

Deceased

Archbishop of Nidaros (Trondheim), Norway


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1459AppointedArchbishop of Nidaros (Trondheim), Norway
28 Jun 1459Ordained BishopArchbishop of Nidaros (Trondheim), Norway
25 Nov 1474DiedArchbishop of Nidaros (Trondheim), Norway

MicroData Summary for Olav Trondsson
Archbishop Olav Trondsson (died ) Archbishop of Nidaros (Trondheim)

  • a bishop for 15.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 203
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1459, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast