Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej z Trok

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1370¹Born
24 Oct 141747.8AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
24 Oct 141747.8Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
4 May 142252.3AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
9 May 145383.4DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maciej z Trok:
Bishop Maciej z Trok (died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,108
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 333, and Page 529
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,818

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013