Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felice Trofino

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Aug 1524AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
21 Dec 1524Ordained BishopBishop of Chieti, Italy
1 Jun 1526AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
1527²DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felice Trofino
Archbishop Felice Trofino (died 1527) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologne

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,091
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,883

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast