Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Trivulzio (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514¹Born
7 Jun 153521.4AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
25 Apr 155036.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1556²42.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1557²43.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
15 Mar 155743.2Elevated to Cardinal
11 Oct 155743.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
16 Oct 155743.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
25 Jun 155945.4DiedBishop of Toulon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Trivulzio (Jr.) (VIAF: 3652620)
Antonio Cardinal Trivulzio (Jr.) (born 1514, died ) Bishop of Toulon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceCastle of Saint-Martin, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Castle of Saint-Martin, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a cardinal for 2.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1535, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017