Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Tripepi

Deceased

Pro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1836Born
1864²27.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 189457.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
1 Oct 189660.2AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
15 Apr 190164.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190164.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
7 Jan 190366.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
28 Jan 190467.6AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
29 Dec 190670.5DiedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Tripepi
Luigi Cardinal Tripepi (born , died ) Pro-Prefect of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCardetto, France

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a cardinal for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018