Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Toralto

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633BornTropien
26 Jul 165724.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 166936.4AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
16 Nov 167643.9AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
Dec 168148.9DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Toralto:
Bishop Gaspare Toralto , Bishop of Tricarico

  • a priest for 24.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 120, and Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014