Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Tontoli

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1613BornManfredonia
20 Jun 164935.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 166350.2AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
Nov 1665³52.3DiedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Tontoli:
Bishop Gabriele Tontoli (born , died Nov 1665) Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)

  • a priest for 16.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 298
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015