Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vincent Tomek, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Order of the Pious Schools


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1892BornPlaveč, Slovakia
28 Aug 190916.8ProfessedMember of Order of the Pious Schools
3 Sep 194754.8AppointedSuperior General of Order of the Pious Schools
1967²74.1ResignedSuperior General of Order of the Pious Schools
18 Apr 198693.4DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Order of the Pious Schools

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Tomek:
Priest Vincent Tomek Sch. P. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Order of the Pious Schools

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013