Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Tolomei, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1653BornCamberaia, Italy
168430.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 May 171258.5Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jul 171258.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
19 Jan 172672.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Tolomei:
Cardinal Giovanni Battista Tolomei S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a cardinal for 13.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013