Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Vande-Escarth y Briceño, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of León

Note/Previous Titular See: (Juan de Toledo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1601³BornMadrid
9 Jun 165958.4AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
12 Jan 166564.0AppointedBishop of León, Spain
6 Apr 167271.3DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Vande-Escarth y Briceño:
Bishop Juan Vande-Escarth y Briceño O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of León

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 132
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 191, Number 1,199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013