Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Efrem Estateos Tocmagi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Karput (Armenian), Turkey

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1822Born
1845²22.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 185936.8Ordained BishopBishop
3 Jul 186341.0Converted
3 Jul 186341.0AppointedBishop of Karput (Armenian), Turkey
1895¹72.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Karput (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Efrem Estateos Tocmagi
Bishop Efrem Estateos Tocmagi (born , died 1895) Bishop Emeritus of Karput

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdesse

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,396
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017