Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Michelangelo Riccardo M. Tiribilli, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1937 BornFirenze
11 Oct 195316.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Jul 196124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Oct 199255.5AppointedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
21 Oct 201073.5RetiredAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Riccardo M. Tiribilli
Abbot Michelangelo Riccardo M. Tiribilli O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Monte Oliveto Maggiore.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2010
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016