Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johannes Tiedemann

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503Born
11 Aug 155956.6SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
29 Nov 156057.9ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
17 Apr 156158.2DiedBishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Tiedemann
Father Johannes Tiedemann (born 1503, died ) Bishop-Elect of Lübeck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStadthagen

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 228
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018