Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Thüngen

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1466Born
15 Feb 151953.1SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
13 Apr 151953.2ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
2 Oct 151953.7Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
16 Jun 154074.4DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Thüngen
Bishop Konrad von Thüngen (born 1466, died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 13, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jun 2018

Quantcast