Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch St. Peter de Thomas, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateEventTitle
1354²AppointedBishop of Patti e Lipari, Italy
Nov 1354³Ordained BishopBishop of Patti e Lipari, Italy
10 May 1359AppointedBishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece
6 Mar 1363AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
5 Jul 1364AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
6 Jan 1366DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Peter de Thomas
Patriarch St. Peter de Thomas O. Carm. (died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 384, and Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 216, and Page 206
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,468

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast