Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hervé-Nicolas Thépault de Brignou

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1703¹Born
13 Sep 174441.6SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
18 Dec 174441.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
7 Mar 174542.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
26 Jan 176663.0DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hervé-Nicolas Thépault de Brignou
Bishop Hervé-Nicolas Thépault de Brignou (born 1703, died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorlaix

  • a bishop for 20.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018