Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Augusto Cardinal Theodoli

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1819Born
7 Jun 188666.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jun 188666.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
26 Jun 189272.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

MicroData Summary for Augusto Theodoli
Augusto Cardinal Theodoli (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1886

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast