Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Lázaro y Terrer, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1658³BornSaldón, Spain
20 Dec 168123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Feb 170546.8AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
9 May 170951.0DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Lázaro y Terrer:
Bishop Pedro Lázaro y Terrer O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

  • a priest for 27.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 397
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 24, Number 40
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015