Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de Teramo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jun 1382AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
21 Sep 1382Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
28 Aug 1391DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Teramo:
Bishop Bernardo de Teramo O.P. (died ) Bishop of L’Aquila

  • a bishop for 8.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 98
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013