Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Teodori

Deceased

Bishop of Sapė, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1652³Born
10 Nov 167523.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 168533.6AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
Jul 1706³54.2DiedBishop of Sapė, Albania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Teodori
Bishop Giorgio Teodori (born , died Jul 1706) Bishop of Sapė

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeuneci

  • a priest for 30.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 344
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018