Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Temudo, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1558AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
15 Apr 1560Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
13 Jan 1567AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
29 Apr 1571DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Jorge Temudo
Archbishop Jorge Temudo O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a bishop for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,731
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018