Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Tello Sandoval

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Mar 1567AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
13 Jun 1578AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
8 Jul 1580DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Tello Sandoval
Bishop Francisco Tello Sandoval (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 79, Number 467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 275
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018