Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gerard Tellin (Teeling)

Deceased

Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654¹Born
12 Nov 167925.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 168026.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 168127.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Gerard Tellin (Teeling)
Father Gerard Tellin (Teeling) (born 1654) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeath, Diocese of Meath, Ireland

Source(s):
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast