Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Telekesy

Deceased

Bishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹Born
29 Dec 168956.9SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
13 Aug 169663.6ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
31 Jul 170269.5AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
3 Mar 171582.1DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for István Telekesy
Bishop István Telekesy (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGyőr

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 177
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast