Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tamás Telegdi

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
31 May 1350AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
25 Aug 1358AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
10 Feb 1367AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
1375¹DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tamás Telegdi
Archbishop Tamás Telegdi (died 1375) Archbishop of Esztergom

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 465, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast