Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Tejada Sáenz, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1768Born
1792²23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
1827²58.2AppointedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
28 Mar 183263.4SelectedBishop of Solsona, Spain
2 Jul 183263.7ConfirmedBishop of Solsona, Spain
16 Sep 183263.9Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
15 Jun 183869.6DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Tejada Sáenz
Bishop Juan José Tejada Sáenz O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAusejo

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,894
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 144
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 149, Number 812
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast