Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos Teixeira de Mendonça

Deceased

Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornLamego
25 Oct 162143.8AppointedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
1622¹44.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
8 Dec 162244.9InstalledBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
8 Oct 162446.7DiedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcos Teixeira de Mendonça:
Bishop Marcos Teixeira de Mendonça (died ) Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a bishop for 2.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 68
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015