Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Niccolò Tedeschi

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal of Felix V)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1386¹BornCatania
Feb 1434³48.1SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
9 Mar 143549.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
4 Jul 143549.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
24 Feb 144559.1DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Tedeschi:
Archbishop Niccolò Tedeschi (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a bishop for 9.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Nov 1440
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013