Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Herman Gerard Te Riele, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Malakal, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1904Born
19 Mar 193025.4Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
29 May 196257.6AppointedPrefect of Malakal, Sudan
1967¹62.1ResignedPrefect of Malakal, Sudan
2 Jan 197368.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Malakal, Sudan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Herman Gerard Te Riele
Father Herman Gerard Te Riele M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Malakal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmsterdam, Netherlands

  • a priest for 42.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018