Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Vincent George Taylor, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1877BornNorfolk
11 Jul 189820.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 May 190224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Aug 192446.9SelectedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
12 Dec 192447.2ConfirmedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
5 Nov 195982.1DiedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Vincent George Taylor:
Abbot Vincent George Taylor O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians

  • a priest for 57.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013