Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henrique de Távora e Brito, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1567AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
29 Jan 1578AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
17 May 1581DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Henrique de Távora e Brito
Archbishop Henrique de Távora e Brito O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018