Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sallustio Tarugi

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1600AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
1 Oct 1607AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
10 Aug 1613DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sallustio Tarugi:
Archbishop Sallustio Tarugi (died ) Archbishop of Pisa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013