Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Tartagni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Veroli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1666Born
23 Dec 170337.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 171548.9AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
1 Sep 175185.3ResignedBishop of Veroli, Italy
7 Jun 175286.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Veroli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Tartagni
Bishop Lorenzo Tartagni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Veroli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDovadolae

  • a priest for 48.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018