Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Theodore of Tarsus

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
602²Born
668¹66.0AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
26 Mar 66866.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
27 May 66967.4InstalledArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
19 Sep 69088.7DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Theodore of Tarsus (VIAF: 98257976)
Archbishop St. Theodore of Tarsus (born 602, died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,749

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 May 2019

Quantcast