Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Tarsis de Acuña, O.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹BornValladolid
11 Feb 160860.1AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
24 Feb 161668.1AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
20 Jun 162072.4DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Tarsis de Acuña:
Archbishop Felipe Tarsis de Acuña O.S. (died ) Archbishop of Granada

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 124, Number 791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196, and Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015