Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Tarquini, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1810BornMarta, Italy
27 Aug 183726.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
22 Dec 187363.2Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jan 187463.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
15 Feb 187463.4DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

MicroData Summary for Camillo Tarquini:
Cardinal Camillo Tarquini S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

  • a cardinal for .1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013