Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Tarnowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1552Born
10 Nov 159745.8AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
4 Jan 159846.0Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
12 Jun 1600³48.4AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
29 Mar 160452.2AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
14 Sep 160553.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Tarnowski (VIAF: 311305271)
Archbishop Jan Tarnowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWarszawa
Death PlaceLowicz

  • a bishop for 7.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195, and Page 287
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,598, Number 2*
  • bd/bp/d: JI, 1 Jul 2019
  • bd/bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast