Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Janusz Tarnowa

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
20 May 1258SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
27 Feb 1260ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
29 Feb 1260Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Aug 1271DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Janusz Tarnowa
Archbishop Janusz Tarnowa (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAnagni

  • a bishop for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 265
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast