Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paweł Tarło

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1561AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
31 Aug 1561Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
21 May 1565DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Paweł Tarło (VIAF: 163157878)
Archbishop Paweł Tarło (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Bernard de Halicz, Convent, Lviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,561, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast