Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Tanner

Deceased

Bishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1526¹Born
5 Nov 157448.8AppointedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
6 Feb 157549.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
4 Jun 157953.4DiedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Tanner
Bishop Edmund Tanner (born 1526, died ) Bishop of Cork and Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,575, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast