Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fortunato Cardinal Tamburini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1683BornModena, Italy
9 Sep 174360.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174360.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
9 Apr 175370.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
9 Aug 176178.5DiedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Tamburini:
Cardinal Fortunato Tamburini O.S.B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto

  • a cardinal for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013