Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de Talaru

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lyon

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1375AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
29 Jul 1375Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
3 Nov 1389Elevated to Cardinal
8 Nov 1389³ResignedArchbishop of Lyon, France
24 Sep 1392DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lyon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Talaru:
Cardinal Jean de Talaru (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lyon

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Nov 1389
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 316
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013