Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Flaminio Cardinal Taja

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600BornSiena, Italy
1 Sep 168181.6Elevated to Cardinal
17 Nov 168181.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
5 Oct 168282.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

MicroData Summary for Flaminio Taja:
Flaminio Cardinal Taja (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

  • a cardinal for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015