Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Tagliavia d’Aragonia

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1499¹BornPalermo
28 May 153738.4AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
10 Oct 154445.7AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
22 Dec 155354.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Jul 155556.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
5 Aug 155859.5DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Tagliavia d’Aragonia:
Pietro Cardinal Tagliavia d’Aragonia (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a cardinal for 4.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1553
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015